Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/04/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/04/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/17/2009