Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/08/2009