Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/10/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009