There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing 100 years of military aviation and expressing continued support for military aviators of the United States Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/14/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11309)
05/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/14/2009-11:14amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/14/2009-11:14amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11309)
10/14/2009-11:03amDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 445.
10/14/2009-11:03amConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11309-11311)
10/14/2009-11:03amMr. Smith (WA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
06/08/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
05/14/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
05/14/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/10/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/24/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/13/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/14/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/08/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.445.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.445. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/14/2009)

Recognizes 100 years of military aviation.

Expresses continued support for military aviators of the Armed Forces.