Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/03/2009