Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/30/2009