Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/26/2009