Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/08/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/28/2009