Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/16/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/16/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/16/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/16/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 01/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 01/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/03/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/04/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2009