Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/19/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2009