Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/13/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/14/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/21/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/21/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/01/2009