Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/09/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 06/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/10/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/10/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/15/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/07/2009