Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/18/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/16/2009