Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/2010