Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/08/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/10/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2009