Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2009