Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2009