Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/27/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/22/2010