Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/13/2009