Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/17/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/17/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/17/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/17/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/17/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/17/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/19/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/19/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/19/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2009