Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/26/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/26/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/26/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/26/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/26/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/26/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/03/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/04/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/02/2009