Text: H.Res.54 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 54


Celebrating the life of President Ronald Wilson Reagan on what would have been the anniversary of his 98th birthday.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 13, 2009

Mr. McClintock submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform


RESOLUTION

Celebrating the life of President Ronald Wilson Reagan on what would have been the anniversary of his 98th birthday.

    Whereas Ronald Reagan was born on February 6, 1911, in Tampico, Illinois, to a family of modest means;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan was educated in Illinois public schools, and in 1932, graduated from Eureka College with a degree in economics and sociology;

    Whereas by 1937, Ronald Reagan moved to California to pursue a career in acting;

    Whereas beginning in 1947, Ronald Reagan served as President of the Screen Actors Guild for 13 years;

    Whereas on March 4, 1952, Ronald Reagan married Nancy Davis, who would become his best friend and lifelong confidant for the following 52 years;

    Whereas in 1964, only 2 years after switching his political party affiliation, Ronald Reagan delivered a stirring speech in support of the nomination of Republican Barry Goldwater for President;

    Whereas in 1966, Ronald Reagan was elected as the 33rd Governor of California, and won re-election 4 years later;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan helped enact sweeping reforms to the state welfare system by working with a Democratic State Legislature;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan understood the need to control state spending, and in 1971, worked with economist Milton Freidman to introduce Proposition One, the first state wide ballot initiative to limit spending;

    Whereas after 2 successful terms as governor, Ronald Reagan declined to run for a 3rd term, and was later elected the 40th President of the United States;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan became the 1st President in 3 decades to serve 2 full terms;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan provided leadership and demonstrated unwavering conviction during the Cold War to inspire individuals throughout the world to seek freedom and democracy in their own Nations;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan is known to many historians as the “great communicator”;

    Whereas Ronald Reagan departed the Oval Office as one of our most popular sitting Presidents;

    Whereas when Ronald Reagan developed Alzheimer’s, he announced his condition in a courageous and honest fashion, and helped call new attention to this disease; and

    Whereas Nancy Reagan continued to care for her husband in steadfast loving dedication as she witnessed her husband’s death on June 5, 2004, at the age of 93: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) celebrates the extraordinary life of President Ronald Wilson Reagan, and expresses its deepest appreciation for his profound public service;

(2) recognizes the significance of Ronald Reagan’s Presidency, and his legacy’s contribution to the United States and rest of the world;

(3) recognizes the significance and influence of Nancy Reagan as the President’s confidant and First Lady; and

(4) directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to transmit a copy of this resolution to Nancy Reagan.