Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/16/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/16/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/17/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/17/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/17/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/18/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/18/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2009