Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/08/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/17/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2010