Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/12/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2010