Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/13/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/26/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/26/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/26/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/26/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/26/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/26/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/26/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/28/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/28/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/19/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/08/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/10/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/20/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2009