Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/10/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/14/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/24/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/29/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/07/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/04/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/23/2010