There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the President should take all necessary steps to expeditiously deploy a missile defense system in Europe that will help provide such a defense to United States allies in Europe while enhancing United States defenses against missile attacks.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/03/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
06/25/2009Referred to House Armed Services
06/25/2009Referred to House Foreign Affairs
06/25/2009Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/25/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/25/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services06/25/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces08/03/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2009)

Expresses: (1) concern over the threat posed by nuclear, chemical, and biological weapons and related delivery systems in the hands of states that sponsor terrorism, such as Iran; and (2) support for the deployment of U.S. missile defense assets in Europe that will provide a defense of the United States and our European allies from the growing missile threat posed by rogue regimes.

Urges the President to expedite the deployment of components of an operational U.S. ground-based missile defense system in Europe.

Requests the President to report annually to Congress on steps taken to move forward with such deployment.

States that the United States shall continue its support for the missile defense of key allies against attacks by rogue regimes.