Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2009