Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/25/2010