Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2009