Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/09/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/09/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/20/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/23/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/24/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/29/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/09/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/01/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/15/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2010