Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/20/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/23/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/23/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/29/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/08/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/20/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/29/2009