There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the citizen-soldiers of the National Guard of the State of Washington, including the 81st Brigade Combat Team (Heavy) of the Washington Army National Guard.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/14/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11311)
07/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/14/2009-11:24amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/14/2009-11:24amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11311)
10/14/2009-11:14amDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 627.
10/14/2009-11:14amConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11311-11313)
10/14/2009-11:14amMr. Smith (WA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
08/03/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
07/10/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
07/10/2009Introduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/10/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/30/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/30/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/13/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/10/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/03/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.627.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.627. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/14/2009)

Expresses the gratitude of the House of Representatives to the members of the Army National Guard and Air National Guard of the State of Washington and their families for their service and sacrifice on behalf of the United States.

Commends the members of the 81st Brigade Combat Team (Heavy) of the Washington Army National Guard, the Army Reserve, and certain other state National Guards on the completion of their most-recent deployment in Iraq.

Recognizes that Team's achievements and all other formerly and presently deployed Washington Army and Air National Guard units and members for their exemplary service.