Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/10/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/30/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/30/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/13/2009