Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/20/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/21/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/14/2009