Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/11/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/11/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/11/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/02/2009