Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/22/2009