Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/24/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 07/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/31/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/14/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/14/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/14/2009