Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/14/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/14/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/16/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/17/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2009