Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/20/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/05/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/05/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010