Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/07/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/07/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/07/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/07/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/14/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/27/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/27/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/27/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/27/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/09/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/09/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/09/2009