Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/02/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/20/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/2009