Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/08/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 10/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/08/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/27/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/27/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/02/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/09/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/09/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/14/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/16/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/16/2009