Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/29/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/29/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/29/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/07/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/27/2009