Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/14/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/15/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/15/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/15/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/15/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/23/2009