Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/25/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/29/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/13/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/16/2009