Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/07/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/13/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/23/2009