Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/23/2009