Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/20/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/20/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/23/2009